+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): DRUMMOND
On February 16, 2018 in the House:
- REFERRED TO FINANCE
- FN1: INDETERMINATE(ADM)
- NR: TUCK, LEDOUX
- DP: BIRCH, KNOPP, WOOL, JOHNSON, KREISS-TOMKINS
- STA RPT CS(STA) 5DP 2NR
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): TARR
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): MILLETT
On April 17, 2017 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): ORTIZ
On April 10, 2017 in the House:
- STA, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS