+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (48)
On August 5, 2009 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
- MANIFEST ERROR(S)
- SIGNED INTO LAW 7/9 CHAPTER 55 SLA 09
- 1:10 PM 6/19/09 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 18, 2009 in the Senate:
- VERSION: HB 222(TITLE AM)
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED Y17 N- A2 V1
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 222(TITLE AM)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/18/2009
On April 17, 2009 in the Senate:
- L&C RPT 4DP
- DP: PASKVAN, MEYER, THOMAS, DAVIS
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
- FN4: ZERO(DHS)
- FN5: ZERO(DHS)
On April 16, 2009 in the Senate:
- L&C
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On April 15, 2009 in the House:
- PASSED Y23 N7 E1 A9
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/15/2009
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 222
- AM NO 1 (TITLE AM) ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- RECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UC
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y33 E1 A6
- KERTTULA NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y29 N10 E1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- COSPONSOR(S): TUCK, GARDNER, LYNN, KERTTULA, GUTTENBERG
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: HB 222(TITLE AM)
On April 14, 2009 in the House:
- FIN RPT 5DP 1DNP 3NR
- DP: FAIRCLOUGH, CRAWFORD, GARA, SALMON, JOULE
- DNP: KELLY
- NR: AUSTERMAN, HAWKER, STOLTZE
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
- FN4: ZERO(DHS)
- FN5: ZERO(DHS)
On April 11, 2009 in the House:
- FIN REFERRAL ADDED AFTER L&C
- FN3: INDETERMINATE(DHS)
- FN2: INDETERMINATE(DHS)
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
- DP: LYNN, BUCH, HOLMES, OLSON
- L&C RPT 4DP
On April 8, 2009 in the House:
- L&C
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS