+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (46)
On July 15, 1994 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE OF LAW 6/7/94
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/6 CHAPTER 94 SLA 94
- 11:45 AM 5/18/94 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 10, 1994 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE SAME AS PASSAGE
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y36 N- A4
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
On May 9, 1994 in the Senate:
- RLS RPT 3CAL 1NR 5/9/94
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- L&C SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): KERTTULA, TAYLOR,
- DONLEY, LITTLE, ZHAROFF, DUNCAN,LINCOLN,
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- PHILLIPS, KELLY, PEARCE, SHARP, RIEGER
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS HB 221(L&C)
- PASSED Y20 N-
- EFFECTIVE DATE SAME AS PASSAGE
On May 9, 1994 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): MACKIE
On May 9, 1994 in the Senate:
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
On May 6, 1994 in the Senate:
- ZERO FN TO HB & SCS PUBLISHED (ADM)
- L&C RPT SCS 2DP 2NR SAME TITLE
On April 20, 1993 in the Senate:
- PREVIOUS H ZERO FNS (LABOR, ADM)
- CRA RPT 4DP
On April 13, 1993 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- CRA, L&C
On April 12, 1993 in the House:
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- COSPONSOR(S): MULDER
- EFFECTIVE DATE VOTE SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED Y32 N2 E8
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 221
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/12/93
On April 7, 1993 in the House:
- FIN RPT 4DP 4NR
- DP: LARSON, GRUSSENDORF, FOSTER, BROWN
- NR: HANLEY, PARNELL, MARTIN, THERRIAULT
- -2 PREVIOUS ZERO FNS(LABOR, ADM) 3/31/93
On April 2, 1993 in the House:
- -2 PREVIOUS ZERO FNS(LABOR, ADM) 3/31/93
- DP: WILLIAMS, GREEN, HUDSON
- DP: PORTER, SITTON, MACKIE, MULDER
- L&C RPT 7DP
On March 31, 1993 in the House:
- -2 ZERO FISCAL NOTES(ADM, LABOR) 3/31/93
- DP: BUNDE, OLBERG
- DP: TOOHEY, WILLIS, SANDERS, DAVIES
- CRA RPT 6DP
On March 12, 1993 in the House:
- CRA, LABOR & COMMERCE, FINANCE
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor