+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (27)
On March 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- REFERRED TO STATE AFFAIRS
- STA, CRA
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On March 17, 2020 in the House:
- VERSION: CSHB 221(TRB)
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED Y31 N5 E3 A1
- BEFORE HOUSE IN THIRD READING
On March 16, 2020 in the House:
- HELD TO 3/17 CALENDAR
On March 13, 2020 in the House:
- ADJOURNED TO 3/16 CALENDAR
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 221(TRB)
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/11/2020
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- TRB CS ADOPTED UC
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 3/13 CALENDAR
- COSPONSOR(S): JOSEPHSON, DRUMMOND
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(LAW)
- NR: THOMPSON
- DP: CLAMAN, DRUMMOND, HANNAN
- CRA RPT CS(TRB) 3DP 1NR
On February 19, 2020 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(LAW)
- AM: TALERICO
- NR: VANCE
- DP: KOPP, LINCOLN, EDGMON, ZULKOSKY
- TRB RPT CS(TRB) 4DP 1NR 1AM
On January 27, 2020 in the House:
- TRB, CRA
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor