+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On May 15, 2022 in the House:
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) 4DP 3NR
- DP: ORTIZ, WOOL, JOSEPHSON, FOSTER
- NR: LEBON, RASMUSSEN, MERRICK
- FN3: (ADM/RETIREMENT PAYMENTS)
- REFERRED TO RULES
On May 9, 2022 in the House:
- RETURNED TO FINANCE COMMITTEE
On April 27, 2022 in the House:
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) 5DP 2DNP 1NR
- DP: ORTIZ, EDGMON, WOOL, JOSEPHSON, FOSTER
- DNP: CARPENTER, THOMPSON
- NR: MERRICK
- FN2: (ADM/RETIREMENT PAYMENTS)
On April 20, 2022 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): WOOL, TUCK, JOSEPHSON
On February 25, 2022 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): ZULKOSKY
On February 4, 2022 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): TARR, CLAMAN, EDGMON
On January 27, 2022 in the House:
- L&C RPT 4DP 3NR
- DP: SCHRAGE, SNYDER, FIELDS, SPOHNHOLZ
- NR: MCCARTY, KAUFMAN, NELSON
- FN1: INDETERMINATE(ADM)
- COSPONSOR(S): HANNAN
On January 26, 2022 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): SPOHNHOLZ
On January 21, 2022 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): SNYDER, SCHRAGE, ORTIZ
On May 19, 2021 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- L&C, FIN
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor