+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (50)
On August 16, 2021 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/29/21
- SIGNED INTO LAW 7/1 CHAPTER 15 SLA 21
On June 17, 2021 in the House:
- 1:22 P.M. 6/17/21 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 22 AM
- MOVED TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR UC
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/19/2021
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): HUGHES, REVAK, SHOWER, GRAY-JACKSON, REINBOLD, KAWASAKI,
- HOLLAND, BISHOP, MICCICHE
- PASSED Y19 N1
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: HB 22 AM
On May 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- RES RPT SCS 5DP 1NR 1AM SAME TITLE
- DP: REVAK, BISHOP, MICCICHE, STEVENS, KAWASAKI
- NR: VON IMHOF
- AM: KIEHL
- FN1: ZERO(DEC)
On May 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- RES
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On May 6, 2021 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/6/2021
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UC
- ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION
- AM NO 2 FAILED Y2 N37 E1
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- AM NO 3 OFFERED AND WITHDRAWN
- PASSED Y38 N1 E1
- COSPONSOR(S): MCCABE, SCHRAGE, DRUMMOND, GILLHAM
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: HB 22 AM
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 22 AM
On May 5, 2021 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): TILTON
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): SHAW
On April 30, 2021 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): SNYDER
On April 28, 2021 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): JOHNSON
On April 26, 2021 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): CARPENTER
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- DP: MCKAY, FIELDS, CRONK, HANNAN, SCHRAGE, PATKOTAK
- RES RPT 6DP 1NR 2AM
- AM: RAUSCHER, GILLHAM
- NR: HOPKINS
- FN1: ZERO(DEC)
On April 7, 2021 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(DEC)
- NR: PATKOTAK
- DP: MCCARTY, DRUMMOND, PRAX, MCCABE, HANNAN, SCHRAGE
- CRA RPT 6DP 1NR
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): RAUSCHER
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- CRA, RES
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/8/21
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor