+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On March 1, 2023 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): GROH
On February 17, 2023 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): MINA
On February 15, 2023 in the House:
- CRA RPT 3DP 2DNP 1NR
- DP: HIMSCHOOT, MEARS, MCCORMICK
- DNP: MCKAY, MCCABE
- NR: RUFFRIDGE
- FN1: INDETERMINATE(GOV/VARIOUS DEPTS)
- FN2: (ADM)
- REFERRED TO STATE AFFAIRS
On February 13, 2023 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): ARMSTRONG
On February 6, 2023 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): SCHRAGE
On January 19, 2023 in the House:
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/9/23
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- CRA, STA, L&C, FIN