+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (43)
On June 24, 2013 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/4/13
- 4:49 PM 5/24/13 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/3 CHAPTER 39 SLA 13
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- VERSION: CSHB 22(L&C)
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED Y20 N-
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 22(L&C)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/8/2013
On April 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- FIN RPT 6DP 1NR
- NR: DUNLEAVY
- FN2: (CED)
- DP: KELLY, MEYER, HOFFMAN, OLSON, BISHOP, FAIRCLOUGH
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- FN2: (CED)
- DP: DUNLEAVY, OLSON, MICCICHE
- L&C RPT 3DP
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- L&C, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On February 22, 2013 in the House:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/22/2013
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- L&C CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 22(L&C)
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- COSPONSOR(S): TUCK, GRUENBERG, SEATON, CHENAULT, KREISS-TOMKINS
- VERSION: CSHB 22(L&C)
- PASSED Y31 E9
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- FN2: (CED)
- NR: KAWASAKI
- DP: COSTELLO, GARA, HOLMES, MUNOZ, NEUMAN, THOMPSON, EDGMON, T.WILSON, STOLTZE
- FIN RPT CS(L&C) 9DP 1NR
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- L&C RPT CS(L&C) 7DP
- COSPONSOR(S): MILLETT
- DP: CHENAULT, HERRON, REINBOLD, SADDLER, MILLETT, JOSEPHSON, OLSON
- FN1: (CED)
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): PRUITT
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): TARR
On January 16, 2013 in the House:
- L&C, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/7/13
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor