+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (48)
On May 19, 2005 in the House:
- SIGNED INTO LAW 5/17 CHAPTER 20 SLA 05
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 8/15/05
On May 3, 2005 in the House:
- 4:37 PM 5/3/05 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 28, 2005 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/28/2005
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 219(FIN)
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): FRENCH, ELLIS, DYSON, WAGONER, SEEKINS, ELTON, COWDERY,
- STEDMAN, GUESS
- PASSED Y19 N- E1
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: CSHB 219(FIN)
On April 25, 2005 in the Senate:
- JUD RPT 4DP 1NR
- DP: SEEKINS, FRENCH, GUESS, HUGGINS
- NR: THERRIAULT
- FN1: ZERO(CRT)
- FN2: ZERO(LAW)
- FN3: ZERO(DPS)
- FN5: ZERO(H.FIN/ADM)
On April 15, 2005 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- JUD
On April 14, 2005 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/14/2005
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 219(FIN)
- PASSED Y33 E7
- COSPONSOR(S): GARDNER, KAPSNER, ELKINS, RAMRAS
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHB 219(FIN)
On April 12, 2005 in the House:
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) NT 8DP 2NR
- DP: HAWKER, HOLM, FOSTER, CROFT, WEYHRAUCH, MOSES, MEYER, CHENAULT;
- NR: STOLTZE, KELLY
- FN1: ZERO(CRT)
- FN2: ZERO(LAW)
- FN3: ZERO(DPS)
- FN5: ZERO(H.FIN/ADM)
- COSPONSOR(S): CHENAULT, MEYER, KERTTULA, FOSTER
On March 30, 2005 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): SAMUELS
On March 23, 2005 in the House:
- JUD RPT 5DP
- DP: GRUENBERG, KOTT, GARA, DAHLSTROM, MCGUIRE
- FN1: ZERO(CRT)
- FN2: ZERO(LAW)
- FN3: ZERO(DPS)
- FN4: INDETERMINATE(ADM)
- COSPONSOR(S): MCGUIRE, GARA, DAHLSTROM, KOTT
On March 15, 2005 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- JUD, FIN
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor