+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (62)
On July 24, 2006 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 10/12/06
- SIGNED INTO LAW 7/14 CHAPTER 92 SLA 06
On July 10, 2006 in the House:
- 2:08 PM 6/21/06 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 6, 2006 in the House:
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y36 E1 A3
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
On May 5, 2006 in the Senate:
- VERSION: SCS CSHB 218(FIN)
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- PASSED Y18 N- A2
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 218(FIN)
On May 4, 2006 in the Senate:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/5 CALENDAR
- FIN SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/4/2006
On May 3, 2006 in the Senate:
- DP: GREEN
- FIN RPT SCS 1DP 4NR SAME TITLE
- NR: WILKEN, HOFFMAN, OLSON, STEDMAN
- FN5: ZERO(CED)
- FN6: ZERO(DFG)
- FN7: ZERO(DPS)
- FN8: INDETERMINATE(REV)
On April 10, 2006 in the Senate:
- DP: ELTON, STEVENS B
- RES RPT SCS 2AM 2DP SAME TITLE
- AM: WAGONER, STEDMAN
- FN5: ZERO(CED)
- FN6: ZERO(DFG)
- FN7: ZERO(DPS)
- FN8: INDETERMINATE(REV)
On April 6, 2006 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): ELKINS, WILSON
On May 6, 2005 in the Senate:
- RES REFERRAL ADDED BEFORE FIN
On May 1, 2005 in the Senate:
- FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On April 29, 2005 in the House:
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/29/2005
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- VERSION: CSHB 218(FIN)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- PASSED Y31 E2 A7
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 218(FIN)
On April 28, 2005 in the House:
- FN4: INDETERMINATE(REV)
- FN3: ZERO(DPS)
- FN2: ZERO(DFG)
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
- NR: JOULE, MOSES, HOLM, KELLY
- DP: HAWKER, FOSTER, CHENAULT;
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) 3DP 4NR
On April 25, 2005 in the House:
- NR: LEDOUX, OLSON, SAMUELS
- RES RPT CS(RES) 2DP 3NR
- DP: CRAWFORD, ELKINS;
- FN3: ZERO(DPS)
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
- FN2: ZERO(DFG)
- FN4: INDETERMINATE(REV)
- FIN REFERRAL ADDED AFTER RES
On April 18, 2005 in the House:
- FN3: ZERO(DPS)
- FN2: ZERO(DFG)
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
- NR: HARRIS, SALMON, LEDOUX
- DP: WILSON, ELKINS, THOMAS;
- FSH RPT CS(FSH) 3DP 3NR
On March 15, 2005 in the House:
- FSH, RES
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS