+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (113)
On January 11, 1996 in the House:
- GOVERNOR VETO SUSTAINED Y31 N29
On June 27, 1995 in the House:
- 11:31 AM 6/13/95 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- VETOED BY GOVERNOR 6/16/95
On May 16, 1995 in the Senate:
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOVERNOR NEXT
On May 9, 1995 in the Senate:
- RESCINDED ACTN ADPTG FIN SCS Y19 N- E1
- BEFORE (S) IN THIRD READING
- RETURN TO 2ND RESCIND ACTION UN CONSENT
- FIN SCS FAILED TO BE ADOPTED Y- N19 E1
- CSHB 217(L&C) AM(EFD FLD) THIRD READING
- PASSED Y13 N6 E1
On May 8, 1995 in the Senate:
- HELD IN THIRD READING TO 5/9 CALENDAR
- READ THE 3RD TIME SCS CSHB 217(FIN)AM S
On May 7, 1995 in the Senate:
- AM NO 4 FAILED Y8 N11 E1
- AM NO 8 FAILED Y7 N12 E1
- AM NO 7 FAILED Y8 N11 E1
- AM NO 6 FAILED Y7 N12 E1
- AM NO 5 FAILED Y7 N12 E1
- RLS RPT 3 CAL 2 OTHER REC 5/7/95
- AM NO 3 FAILED Y9 N10 E1
- AM NO 2 FAILED Y8 N11 E1
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y7 N12 E1
- FIN SCS ADOPTED Y12 N7 E1
- MOTION TO ADOPT FIN SCS
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- AM NO 9 FAILED Y7 N12 E1
- AM NO 10 ADOPTED Y16 N3 E1
- AM NO 10 RULED OUT OF ORDER
- AM NO 19 FAILED Y5 N14 E1
- AM NO 11 FAILED Y8 N11 E1
- ADVANCE TO THIRD RDG FAILED Y12 N7 E1
- FLD TO RESCIND ACTION FLG AM 3 Y9 N10 E1
- AM NO 21 FAILED Y7 N12 E1
- AM NO 20 FAILED Y8 N11 E1
- THIRD READING 5/8 CALENDAR
- AM NO 18 FAILED Y5 N14 E1
- AM NO 17 FAILED Y5 N14 E1
- AM NO 16 FAILED Y5 N14 E1
- AM NO 15 FAILED Y6 N13 E1
- AM NO 14 FAILED Y5 N14 E1
- AM NO 13 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 12 FAILED Y7 N12 E1
On May 6, 1995 in the Senate:
- (H) ZERO FN (DOE)
- FN TO SCS (ADM)
- FIN RPT SCS 4DP 1NR 1DNP SAME TITLE
On May 5, 1995 in the Senate:
- FINANCE
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
On May 4, 1995 in the House:
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- EFFECTIVE DATE FAILED Y25 N15
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y22 N18
- RETURN TO SECOND FLD Y13 N27
- RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
On May 3, 1995 in the House:
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 217(L&C) AM
- RET TO 2ND/RESCIND/AM3 FLD Y11 N27 E1 A1
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 26 UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 26 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- PASSED Y24 N16
- EFFECTIVE DATE FAILED Y26 N14
- KUBINA NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
On May 2, 1995 in the House:
- AM TO AM 2 FAILED Y15 N24 E1
- AM NO 5 FAILED Y5 N33 A2
- AM NO 4 FAILED Y5 N34 A1
- ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION
- AM TO AM 3 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 3 OFFERED
- AM NO 2 FAILED Y15 N25
- ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION
- AM NO 2 OFFERED
- AM NO 7 FAILED Y20 N20
- AM NO 1 AS AMENDED Y30 N9 E1
- AM TO AM 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 OFFERED
- L&C CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/02/95
- AM NO 6 FAILED Y15 N25
- AM 3 AS AMENDED ADOPTED Y26 N14
- AM NO 8 FAILED Y11 N29
- AM NO 19 FAILED Y10 N26 A4
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/03 CALENDAR
- AM NO 9 FAILED Y13 N27
- AM NO 24 FAILED Y12 N23 A5
- AM NO 23 FAILED Y8 N27 A5
- AM NO 22 FAILED Y11 N24 A5
- AM NO 21 FAILED Y3 N33 A4
- AM NO 20 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 25 WITHDRAWN
- AM NO 18 FAILED Y8 N28 A4
- AM NO 16 FAILED Y11 N29
- AM NO 15 FAILED Y12 N28
- AM NO 14 FAILED Y14 N26
- AM NO 13 FAILED Y10 N30
- AM NO 12 NOT OFFERED
- AM NO 11 FAILED Y11 N29
- AM NO 10 ADOPTED Y37 N3
- AM NO 17 FAILED Y10 N30
On May 1, 1995 in the House:
- DP: ROKEBERG, PORTER
- L&C RPT CS(L&C) NT 2DP 3NR
- NR: KOTT, SANDERS, MASEK
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (DOE) 4/22/95
On April 22, 1995 in the House:
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (DOE)
- DNP: FINKELSTEIN
- DP: VEZEY, PORTER, GREEN, BUNDE, TOOHEY
- JUD RPT CS(JUD) NT 5DP 1DNP
On April 20, 1995 in the House:
- L&C REFERRAL ADDED
On April 18, 1995 in the House:
- FISCAL NOTE (DOE)
- AM: ROBINSON
- NR: G.DAVIS
- DP: BUNDE, TOOHEY
- HES RPT CS(HES) NT 2DP 1NR 1AM
On March 1, 1995 in the House:
- HES, JUDICIARY
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor