+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (84)
On June 27, 2018 in the House:
On May 9, 2018 in the House:
- MANIFEST ERROR(S)
On April 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSSHB 216(FIN) AM
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/30/2018
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- PASSED Y20 N-
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): GIESSEL
- VERSION: CSSSHB 216(FIN) AM
On April 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- FN7: (REV)
- FIN RPT 6DP
- DP: HOFFMAN, MACKINNON, BISHOP, STEVENS, OLSON, MICCICHE
- FN2: ZERO(DHS)
- FN3: ZERO(DHS)
- FN15: (LEG)
- FN8: ZERO(LAW)
- FN9: (ADM)
- FN10: (ADM/FUND CAP)
- FN13: INDETERMINATE(AJS)
- FN14: (COR)
On April 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- HUGHES
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): MICCICHE, STEDMAN, BISHOP, COSTELLO, VON IMHOF, SHOWER
On April 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On April 12, 2018 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/12/2018
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN CS ADOPTED UC
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED Y22 N18
- ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSSHB 216(FIN) AM
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- COSPONSOR(S): SPOHNHOLZ, BIRCH, PARISH, DRUMMOND, TUCK, REINBOLD, TARR,
- JOSEPHSON, RAUSCHER, CHENAULT, SULLIVAN-LEONARD
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSSSHB 216(FIN) AM
- PASSED Y40
On April 11, 2018 in the House:
- FN3: ZERO(DHS)
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) 9DP 2AM
- DP: GARA, PRUITT, ORTIZ, THOMPSON, GUTTENBERG, GRENN, TILTON, SEATON, FOSTER
- AM: KAWASAKI, WILSON
- FN2: ZERO(DHS)
- FN10: (ADM/FUND CAP)
- FN7: (REV)
- FN8: ZERO(LAW)
- FN9: (ADM)
- FN11: (COR)
- FN12: (LEG)
- FN13: INDETERMINATE(AJS)
On April 9, 2018 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): GARA, KAWASAKI, GUTTENBERG
On April 6, 2018 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): ORTIZ
On April 4, 2018 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): STUTES
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- FN7: (REV)
- FN6: (LEG)
- FN5: (COR)
- FN4: (AJS)
- FN3: ZERO(DHS)
- FN2: ZERO(DHS)
- FN1: ZERO(ADM)
- AM: EASTMAN
- DP: KOPP, LEDOUX, MILLETT, KREISS-TOMKINS, CLAMAN
- JUD RPT CS(JUD) NT 5DP 1AM
On January 26, 2018 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): FANSLER
On January 19, 2018 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): LEDOUX
On January 16, 2018 in the House:
- JUD, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- SPONSOR SUBSTITUTE INTRODUCED
On November 29, 2017 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): CLAMAN
On October 23, 2017 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): GRENN
On April 21, 2017 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): SADDLER
On April 14, 2017 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): WESTLAKE
On April 7, 2017 in the House:
- JUD, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Amendment
AM 1
AM NO 1 ADOPTED Y22 N18
+ − Sponsors (36)
Type:
Primary Sponsor