+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On May 17, 2003 in the Senate:
- STA RPT 4DP
- DP: STEVENS G, DYSON, GUESS, COWDERY
- FN1: ZERO(DOT)
- REFERRED TO FINANCE
On May 10, 2003 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- STA, FIN
On May 9, 2003 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/9/2003
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- STA CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 2 (TITLE AM) OFFERED & WITHDRAWN
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 215(STA) AM
- PASSED Y33 N1 E5 A1
- COSPONSOR(S): OGG, LYNN
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHB 215(STA) AM
On May 7, 2003 in the House:
- FIN RPT CS(STA) NT 7DP
- DP: HAWKER, STOLTZE, CROFT, WHITAKER,
- FOSTER, CHENAULT, MEYER
- FN1: ZERO(DOT)
On May 6, 2003 in the House:
- STA RPT CS(STA) NT 1DP 5NR
- DP: WEYHRAUCH; NR: GRUENBERG, HOLM,
- LYNN, DAHLSTROM, BERKOWITZ
- FN1: ZERO(DOT)
On March 26, 2003 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- STA, FIN