+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (34)
On June 24, 2011 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/6/11
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/8 CHAPTER 17 SLA 11
- 3:12 PM 5/25/11 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 2, 2011 in the House:
- MANIFEST ERROR(S)
On April 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- VERSION: HB 214 AM
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): COGHILL, OLSON, STEDMAN, MCGUIRE, EGAN, KOOKESH, STEVENS
- PASSED Y20 N-
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 214 AM
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/16/2011
- FN1: ZERO(DOT)
- DP: HOFFMAN, STEDMAN, THOMAS, EGAN, MCGUIRE, OLSON, ELLIS
- FIN RPT 7DP
On April 13, 2011 in the Senate:
- TRA RPT 5DP
- DP: KOOKESH, HUGGINS, THOMAS, EGAN, MENARD
- FN1: ZERO(DOT)
On April 11, 2011 in the Senate:
- TRA, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On April 8, 2011 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/8/2011
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 214 AM
- PASSED Y39 E1
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: HB 214 AM
On April 6, 2011 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(DOT)
- DP: GRUENBERG, PETERSEN, JOHNSON, FEIGE, MUNOZ, PRUITT
- TRA RPT 6DP
On March 29, 2011 in the House:
- TRA
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor