+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (50)
On August 20, 2003 in the House:
- 2:00 PM 6/10/03 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/13 CHAPTER 85 SLA 03
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/11/03
On May 21, 2003 in the House:
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y39 E1
On May 20, 2003 in the Senate:
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: SCS CSHB 214(JUD)(EFD FLD S)
On May 19, 2003 in the Senate:
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 214(JUD)
- PASSED Y15 N5
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) FAILED Y12 N8
- TAYLOR NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
On May 18, 2003 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/18/2003
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- JUD SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/19 CALENDAR
On May 13, 2003 in the Senate:
- JUD RPT SCS 1DP 2NR SAME TITLE
- NR: OGAN, THERRIAULT; DP: FRENCH
- FN1: ZERO(CRT)
- FN2: ZERO(LAW)
On May 2, 2003 in the Senate:
- L&C RPT 2DP 1NR
- DP: BUNDE, SEEKINS; NR: STEVENS G
- FN1: ZERO(CRT)
- FN2: ZERO(LAW)
On April 15, 2003 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- L&C, JUD
On April 14, 2003 in the House:
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHB 214(JUD)
On April 11, 2003 in the House:
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 214(JUD)
- PASSED Y28 N9 E3
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- MASEK NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- COSPONSOR(S): LYNN
On April 10, 2003 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/10/2003
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- JUD CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y11 N26 E2 A1
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/11 CALENDAR
On April 8, 2003 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): HEINZE
On April 7, 2003 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): DAHLSTROM
On April 4, 2003 in the House:
- JUD RPT CS(JUD) 3DP 2DNP 1NR 1AM
- DP: HOLM, SAMUELS, MCGUIRE; DNP: GARA,
- GRUENBERG; NR: ANDERSON; AM: OGG
- FN1: ZERO(CRT)
- FN2: ZERO(LAW)
On April 2, 2003 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): MCGUIRE, HAWKER
On March 28, 2003 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): ROKEBERG, MEYER
On March 26, 2003 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- JUD
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor