+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (55)
On September 7, 2004 in the House:
- 4:52 PM 7/16/04 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 7/26 CHAPTER 165 SLA 04
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 1/1/05
On May 9, 2004 in the House:
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y34 N2 E2 A2
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- COSPONSOR(S): ANDERSON
On May 3, 2004 in the House:
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
On May 1, 2004 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/1/2004
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 213(FIN)
- PASSED Y17 N2 A1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: SCS CSHB 213(FIN)
On April 22, 2004 in the Senate:
- FIN RPT SCS 4DP 3NR SAME TITLE
- DP: WILKEN, DYSON, BUNDE, STEVENS B;
- NR: GREEN, HOFFMAN, OLSON
- FN1: (ADM)
On April 8, 2004 in the Senate:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): WILKEN, COWDERY,
- BUNDE, STEVENS B, ELTON, WAGONER, DYSON
On March 31, 2004 in the Senate:
- STA RPT 2DP 2NR
- DP: STEVENS G, COWDERY; NR: STEDMAN,
- GUESS
- FN1: (ADM)
On March 5, 2004 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- STA, FIN
On March 4, 2004 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/4/2004
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 213(FIN)
- PASSED Y31 N3 E2 A4
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- COSPONSOR(S): GARA, SEATON, LYNN
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHB 213(FIN)
On March 1, 2004 in the House:
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) 6DP 1NR
- DP: MEYER, HAWKER, JOULE, CROFT,
- FOSTER, WILLIAMS; NR: STOLTZE
- FN1: (ADM)
On February 26, 2004 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): FOSTER
On February 18, 2004 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): CRAWFORD
On February 16, 2004 in the House:
- L&C RPT CS(L&C) 5DP
- DP: CRAWFORD, LYNN, GATTO, DAHLSTROM,
- ANDERSON
- FN1: (ADM)
On February 9, 2004 in the House:
- TRA RPT CS(TRA) 6NR 1AM
- NR: KAPSNER, KOOKESH, MASEK, OGG,
- STEPOVICH, HOLM; AM: KOHRING
- FN1: (ADM)
- FIN REFERRAL ADDED AFTER L&C
On March 26, 2003 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- TRA, L&C
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor