+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (35)
On July 10, 1997 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE OF LAW 7/1/97
- 2:56 PM 5/30/97 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/13 CHAPTER 86 SLA 97
On May 13, 1997 in the Senate:
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOVERNOR NEXT
On May 11, 1997 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED Y18 N- E1 A1
- CROSS SPONSOR(S):LINCOLN, MACKIE, TAYLOR
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 212(TITLE AM)
On May 10, 1997 in the Senate:
- HELD TO 5/11/97 CALENDAR
On May 9, 1997 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/9/97
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- THIRD READING 5/10 CALENDAR
On May 8, 1997 in the Senate:
- (H) ZERO FN (DCRA)
- PHILLIPS, WILKEN
- DP: MACKIE, DONLEY, HOFFMAN,
- CRA RPT 5DP
On May 6, 1997 in the House:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/6/97
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION
On May 6, 1997 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
On May 6, 1997 in the House:
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 212(TITLE AM)
- PASSED Y37 N2 E1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
On May 6, 1997 in the Senate:
- CRA
On May 2, 1997 in the House:
- JUD REFERRAL WAIVED
On April 10, 1997 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): NICHOLIA
On April 7, 1997 in the House:
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (DCRA)
- DP: DYSON, KOOKESH; NR: OGAN, RYAN, IVAN
- CRA RPT 2DP 3NR
On March 27, 1997 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): DYSON
On March 25, 1997 in the House:
- CRA, JUDICIARY
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)