+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (32)
On May 16, 2003 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- FIN
- REFERRED TO FINANCE
On May 15, 2003 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/15/2003
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- HES CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 211(HES)
- PASSED Y37 E3
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- BERKOWITZ NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- RECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UNAN CONSENT
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y37 E3
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- COSPONSOR(S): OGG, SEATON, GUTTENBERG,
- MCGUIRE, DAHLSTROM, CRAWFORD, LYNN,
- KERTTULA, CISSNA
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHB 211(HES)
On May 14, 2003 in the House:
- FIN RPT CS(HES) 5DP 2NR
- DP: HAWKER, WHITAKER, FOSTER,
- KERTTULA, MEYER; NR: BERKOWITZ, MOSES
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
- FN3: (EED)
On April 11, 2003 in the House:
- HES RPT CS(HES) 5DP 1AM
- DP: CISSNA, COGHILL, GATTO, WOLF,
- WILSON; AM: SEATON
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
- FN2: (EED)
On March 31, 2003 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): GARA
On March 24, 2003 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- HES, FIN
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor