+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (45)
On July 21, 1993 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE OF LAW 9/22/93
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/24 CHAPTER 66 SLA 93
- 1:20 PM 6/3/93 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 11, 1993 in the House:
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y39 N- A1
On May 11, 1993 in the Senate:
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y18 N2
- TAKEN FROM PENDING FILE
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): PEARCE, TAYLOR
On May 2, 1993 in the Senate:
- PLACED IN SECRETARY'S PENDING FILE
- MOVED TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR
On May 1, 1993 in the Senate:
- HELD ON RECONSIDERATION TO 5/2/93
On April 30, 1993 in the Senate:
- HELD ON RECONSIDERATION TO 5/1/93
- RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
On April 29, 1993 in the Senate:
- KERTTULA NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- PASSED Y19 N1 HB 211 AM S
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 211
On April 28, 1993 in the Senate:
- HELD TO 4/29/93 CALENDAR
On April 27, 1993 in the Senate:
- RULES 4 CALENDAR AND DO PASS 4/27/93
- PREVIOUS H ZERO FN (DCRA)
- ADVANCE TO THIRD READING FAILED Y11 N9
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): DONLEY
- THIRD READING 4/28 CALENDAR
On April 21, 1993 in the Senate:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): LEMAN, ELLIS
- RULES
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
On April 20, 1993 in the House:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/20/93
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 211
- PASSED Y39 N- A1
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
On April 15, 1993 in the House:
- -PREVIOUS ZERO FN (DCRA) 4/2/93
- DP: KOTT, GREEN, NORDLUND, PORTER
- JUD RPT 4DP
On April 2, 1993 in the House:
- -ZERO FISCAL NOTE (DCRA) 4/2/93
- NR: BUNDE, WILLIS
- DP:SANDERS,DAVIES,TOOHEY,OLBERG,WILLIAMS
- CRA RPT 5DP 2NR
On March 12, 1993 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): BROWN
On March 10, 1993 in the House:
- CRA, JUDICIARY
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)