+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (61)
On July 14, 2000 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE OF LAW 7/1/01
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/1 CHAPTER 99 SLA 00
- 9:55 AM 5/18/00 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 30, 2000 in the House:
- COURT RULE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y40
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
On April 29, 2000 in the Senate:
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
On April 28, 2000 in the Senate:
- RECONSIDERATION HELD TO 4/29/00
On April 27, 2000 in the Senate:
- RECONSIDERATION HELD TO 4/28/00
On April 26, 2000 in the Senate:
- RECONSIDERATION HELD TO 4/27/00
On April 25, 2000 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/25/00
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 211(FIN)
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- COURT RULE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- PEARCE NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- PASSED Y19 N- A1
On April 19, 2000 in the Senate:
- HOUSE ZERO FISCAL NOTE (DCED)
- ADAMS, LEMAN
- NR: PHILLIPS, GREEN, PETE KELLY,
- DP: TORGERSON, WILKEN, DONLEY;
- FIN RPT SCS 3DP 5NR SAME TITLE
On April 17, 2000 in the House:
- AM NO 5 AS AMENDED ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 211(FIN) AM
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 5 UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 5 OFFERED
- AM TO AM 5 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
- COURT RULE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
On April 17, 2000 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- FIN
On April 17, 2000 in the House:
- PASSED Y39 E1
On April 15, 2000 in the House:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/17 CALENDAR
- AM NO 4 FAILED Y16 N17 E2 A5
- AM NO 3 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 2 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y17 N18 E2 A3
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/15/00
On April 14, 2000 in the House:
- DP: FOSTER; NR: THERRIAULT, BUNDE,
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) NT 1DP 9NR
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (DCED) 3/8/00
- AUSTERMAN, DAVIES, GRUSSENDORF, MOSES,
- DAVIS, WILLIAMS, PHILLIPS
On April 11, 2000 in the House:
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (DCED) 3/8/00
- KERTTULA, KOTT
- DP: ROKEBERG; NR: MURKOWSKI, JAMES,
- JUD RPT CS(JUD) NT 1DP 4NR
On March 8, 2000 in the House:
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (DCED)
- NR: MURKOWSKI, HARRIS, HALCRO
- DP: ROKEBERG; DNP: CISSNA, BRICE;
- L&C RPT CS(L&C) NT 1DP 2DNP 3NR
On April 22, 1999 in the House:
- L&C, JUD, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
+ − Sponsor
ROKEBERG BY REQUEST
Type:
Primary Sponsor