+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (55)
On September 19, 2014 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 10/14/14
- LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 5/14/14
On September 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 5/14/14
On September 19, 2014 in the House:
- SIGNED INTO LAW 7/16 CHAPTER 95 SLA 14
- FN(S) ATTACHED TO APPROP. BILL HB 266
- 10:30 AM 7/14/14 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- FN1: (EED)
On April 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y7 N13
- BEFORE THE SENATE IN THIRD READING
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 UNAN CONSENT
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
- PASSED Y20 N-
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: CSHB 210(FIN) AM
On April 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- MOVED TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 210(FIN) AM
- NOT TAKEN UP 4/18 - ON 4/19 CALENDAR
On April 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/18 CALENDAR
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/17/2014
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- FN1: (EED)
- NR: KELLY, DUNLEAVY, FAIRCLOUGH, BISHOP, OLSON
- DP: MEYER, HOFFMAN
- FIN RPT 2DP 5NR
On April 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- DP: STEVENS, STEDMAN, HUGGINS
- EDC RPT 3DP 1AM
- FN1: (EED)
- AM: GARDNER
On April 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- EDC, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On April 7, 2014 in the House:
- VERSION: CSHB 210(FIN) AM
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- COSPONSOR(S): TUCK, TARR
- PASSED Y40
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 210(FIN) AM
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/7/2014
On March 27, 2014 in the House:
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) NT 11DP
- FN1: (EED)
- DP: GUTTENBERG, HOLMES, T.WILSON, MUNOZ, NEUMAN, THOMPSON, EDGMON, GARA,
- COSTELLO, STOLTZE, AUSTERMAN
On March 25, 2014 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): HOLMES, GUTTENBERG
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- FN1: (EED)
- AM: P.WILSON
- NR: REINBOLD, KITO III
- DP: SADDLER, SEATON, GATTIS
- EDC RPT CS(EDC) NT 3DP 2NR 1AM
On January 24, 2014 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): FOSTER
On January 22, 2014 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): GARA
On January 21, 2014 in the House:
- EDC, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/10/14