+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (47)
On August 20, 2003 in the House:
- 11:08 AM 6/9/03 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/18 CHAPTER 118 SLA 03
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/16/03
On May 20, 2003 in the Senate:
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: CSHB 210(RES)(EFD FLD S)
On May 19, 2003 in the Senate:
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 210(RES)
- PASSED Y14 N6
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) FAILED Y12 N8
- ELLIS NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
On May 18, 2003 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/18/2003
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/19 CALENDAR
On May 15, 2003 in the Senate:
- FIN RPT 4DP 2DNP
- DP: WILKEN, TAYLOR, BUNDE, STEVENS B;
- DNP: HOFFMAN, OLSON
- FN1: ZERO(DNR)
- FN3: (DFG)
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): WILKEN, TAYLOR, OGAN,
- DYSON, SEEKINS, COWDERY
On May 13, 2003 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- FIN
On May 12, 2003 in the House:
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 210(RES)
- PASSED Y31 N4 E4 A1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHB 210(RES)
On May 10, 2003 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/10/2003
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RES CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/12 CALENDAR
- COSPONSOR(S): DAHLSTROM
On May 9, 2003 in the House:
- FIN RPT CS(RES) 5DP 2DNP 2NR
- DP: MEYER, HAWKER, STOLTZE, WHITAKER,
- WILLIAMS; DNP: FOSTER, MOSES;
- NR: CHENAULT, HARRIS
- FN1: ZERO(DNR)
- FN3: (DFG)
- COSPONSOR(S): HOLM, WHITAKER, LYNN
On April 7, 2003 in the House:
- RES RPT CS(RES) 5DP 3AM
- DP: LYNN, GATTO, MASEK, WOLF, FATE;
- AM: MORGAN, KERTTULA, GUTTENBERG
- FN1: ZERO(DNR)
- FN2: (DFG)
On March 28, 2003 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): STOLTZE
On March 24, 2003 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- RES, FIN
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor