+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On February 26, 2003 in the House:
- HES RPT CS(HES) NT 7DP
- DP: GATTO, WOLF, HEINZE, CISSNA,
- KAPSNER, SEATON, WILSON
- FN1: (HSS)
- REFERRED TO FINANCE
- COSPONSOR(S): MOSES
On February 21, 2003 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): SEATON
On February 12, 2003 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): HEINZE
On February 3, 2003 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): CROFT
On January 29, 2003 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): GARA
On January 21, 2003 in the House:
- PREFILE RELEASED (1/10/03)
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- HES, FIN
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor