+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On June 14, 2017 in the House:
- WITHDRAW BY SPONSOR - MOTION WITHDRAWN
On March 3, 2017 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): RAUSCHER
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): WILSON
On January 20, 2017 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): SULLIVAN-LEONARD
On January 18, 2017 in the House:
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/9/17
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- STA, FIN
- REFERRED TO STATE AFFAIRS