+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (59)
On September 28, 2007 in the House:
- SIGNED INTO LAW 7/3 CHAPTER 36 SLA 07
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
On June 20, 2007 in the House:
- 10:03 AM 6/13/07 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 14, 2007 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y39 N1
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
On May 13, 2007 in the Senate:
- VERSION: SCS CSHB 209(FIN)
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
- FN5: (CED)
On May 12, 2007 in the Senate:
- FIN SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/12/2007
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- PASSED Y20 N-
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 209(FIN)
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- THERRIAULT NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
On May 11, 2007 in the Senate:
- FN4: INDETERMINATE(LAW)
- NR: HOFFMAN, STEDMAN, ELTON, THOMAS
- DP: DYSON, HUGGINS
- TITLE CHANGE: SCR 10
- FIN RPT SCS 2DP 4NR NEW TITLE
On May 9, 2007 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED Y28 N10 E1 A1
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 209(JUD)
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
On May 9, 2007 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- FIN
On May 9, 2007 in the House:
- VERSION: CSHB 209(JUD)
On May 8, 2007 in the House:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/9 CALENDAR
- AM NO 3 FAILED Y15 N22 E3
- AM NO 2 FAILED Y18 N19 E3
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y17 N20 E3
- JUD CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- MOVED TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/8/2007
On May 7, 2007 in the House:
- DP: FOSTER, MEYER
- FIN RPT CS(JUD) NT 2DP 5NR 1AM
- NR: THOMAS, STOLTZE, KELLY, HAWKER, CHENAULT
- FN1: ZERO(H.L&C/CED)
- AM: CRAWFORD
On May 3, 2007 in the House:
- FN3: ZERO(LAW)
- FN2: ZERO(H.L&C/CRT)
- FN1: ZERO(H.L&C/CED)
- NR: COGHILL, DAHLSTROM, SAMUELS, HOLMES, GRUENBERG, LYNN
- DP: RAMRAS
- JUD RPT CS(JUD) NT 1DP 6NR
On April 30, 2007 in the House:
- DNP: GARDNER
- L&C RPT CS(L&C) NT 1DP 1DNP 2NR 2AM
- DP: OLSON
- FN3: ZERO(LAW)
- NR: BUCH, RAMRAS
- AM: LEDOUX, NEUMAN
- FN1: ZERO(H.L&C/CED)
- FN2: ZERO(H.L&C/CRT)
On March 19, 2007 in the House:
- L&C, JUD, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsor
LABOR & COMMERCE
Type:
Primary Sponsor