+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (25)
On January 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
- NR: MICCICHE, GARDNER
- DP: COSTELLO, MEYER
- L&C RPT 2DP 2NR
- FN2: ZERO(LAW)
On May 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- L&C, JUD
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On May 10, 2017 in the House:
- VERSION: HB 208
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
On May 8, 2017 in the House:
- TECHNICAL SESSION - RECON HELD TO 5/10
On May 5, 2017 in the House:
- PASSED Y26 N7 E7
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 208
- TARR NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y33 E7
- COSPONSOR(S): KOPP
On May 3, 2017 in the House:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/5 CALENDAR
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/3/2017
On April 15, 2017 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(LAW)
- NR: EASTMAN, FANSLER, KREISS-TOMKINS, LEDOUX, REINBOLD
- DP: KOPP, CLAMAN
- JUD RPT 2DP 5NR
On March 31, 2017 in the House:
- JUD
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS