+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On March 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION
- TRA
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- VERSION: HB 208
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- PASSED Y38 E1 A1
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 208
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/11/2020
On February 14, 2020 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(DOT)
- DP: EDGMON, TALERICO, GILLIS, DRUMMOND, CLAMAN, STORY, STUTES
- TRA RPT 7DP
On January 21, 2020 in the House:
- TRA
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor