+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (44)
On October 2, 2020 in the House:
- RETURN TO GOVERNOR 5/20/20 FOR PERMANENT FILING
On March 18, 2020 in the House:
- PARTIAL VETO AND REDUCTIONS
- SIGNED INTO LAW 3/16 CHAPTER 2 SLA 20
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
On March 13, 2020 in the House:
- LETTER TO AMHTA RECEIVED & TRANSMITTED TO GOV 5:39 P.M. 3/12/20
- LETTER TO AMHTA PER AS 37.14.005(C) FORTHCOMING
- 5:45 P.M. 3/11/20 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On March 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- PASSED Y19 N- E1
- FIN RPT SCS 7DP NEW TITLE
- TITLE CHANGE: SCR 12
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/11/2020
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN SCS ADOPTED UC
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 206(FIN)
- DP: STEDMAN, VON IMHOF, HOFFMAN, WILSON, WIELECHOWSKI, BISHOP, OLSON
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: SCS CSHB 206(FIN)
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- CONCUR MESSAGE READ AND HELD
- WAIVE UNIFORM RULE 41(C)
- CONCUR MESSAGE TAKEN UP
- TITLE CHANGE: SCR 12
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y36 N2 E2
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y38 E2
On March 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN CS ADOPTED UC
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- PASSED Y37 N2 E1
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 206(FIN)
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHB 206(FIN)
On March 2, 2020 in the House:
- HELD TO 3/3 CALENDAR
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/2/2020
On February 28, 2020 in the House:
- SULLIVAN-LEONARD, FOSTER, JOHNSTON
- DP: ORTIZ, CARPENTER, TILTON, LEBON, MERRICK, WOOL, JOSEPHSON,
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) 10DP
On January 21, 2020 in the House:
- OMB ATTACHMENT PER AS 37.14.003
- GOVERNOR'S TRANSMITTAL LETTER
- FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsor
HOUSE RULES BY REQUEST OF THE GOVERNOR
Type:
Primary Sponsor