+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (33)
On April 14, 2012 in the Senate:
- REFERRED TO RULES
- FN3: ZERO(LWF)
- FN2: ZERO(ADM)
- NR: STEDMAN, OLSON
- DP: HOFFMAN, THOMAS, EGAN
- FIN RPT 3DP 2NR
On April 10, 2012 in the Senate:
- FN3: ZERO(LWF)
- FN2: ZERO(ADM)
- DP: WIELECHOWSKI, KOOKESH, GIESSEL
- STA RPT 3DP
On April 12, 2011 in the Senate:
- STA, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On April 11, 2011 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/11/2011
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 205
- PASSED Y40
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- COSPONSOR(S): COSTELLO, SADDLER
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: HB 205
On April 9, 2011 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(ADM)
- NR: STOLTZE
- THOMAS
- DP: FAIRCLOUGH, GUTTENBERG, T.WILSON, EDGMON, JOULE, NEUMAN, COSTELLO, DOOGAN,
- FIN RPT 9DP 1NR
On March 29, 2011 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): P.WILSON
- FN1: ZERO(ADM)
- NR: JOHANSEN
- DP: PETERSEN, SEATON, GRUENBERG, KELLER, P.WILSON, LYNN
- STA RPT 6DP 1NR
On March 23, 2011 in the House:
- STA, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS