+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (34)
On May 15, 2003 in the Senate:
- STA REFERRAL WAIVED
- REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
On May 10, 2003 in the Senate:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): ELTON, DYSON, DAVIS
- STA, JUD, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On May 9, 2003 in the House:
- WEYHRAUCH NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/9/2003
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 205
- PASSED Y27 N8 E3 A2
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UNAN CONSENT
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- COSPONSOR(S): OGG, WILSON, CRAWFORD,
- KOOKESH
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: HB 205
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y33 N3 E4
On May 8, 2003 in the House:
- FOSTER, HARRIS, WILLIAMS; NR: STOLTZE,
- FIN RPT 7DP 2NR
- DP: HAWKER, MEYER, CHENAULT, WHITAKER,
- MOSES
- FN2: ZERO(REV)
- COSPONSOR(S): HEINZE
On April 15, 2003 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): BERKOWITZ
On April 4, 2003 in the House:
- FIN REFERRAL ADDED AFTER STA
- FN1: (REV)
- NR: LYNN, DAHLSTROM
- BERKOWITZ; DNP: WEYHRAUCH;
- DP: SEATON, GRUENBERG, HOLM,
- STA RPT 4DP 1DNP 2NR
On March 19, 2003 in the House:
- STA
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor