+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (36)
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- L&C RPT 2DP 1NR
- DP: STEDMAN, MICCICHE
- NR: DUNLEAVY
- FN2: INDETERMINATE(REV)
- REFERRED TO FINANCE
On March 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): OLSON, MCGUIRE, BISHOP
- FIN REFERRAL ADDED AFTER L&C
On March 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): STEVENS, MICCICHE, STEDMAN, DYSON, EGAN
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- L&C
On March 14, 2014 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/14/2014
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSSHB 204(FIN)
- PASSED Y38 E1 A1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- COSPONSOR(S): LEDOUX, GARA, TUCK, HUGHES, TARR
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSSSHB 204(FIN)
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): NAGEAK
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) 7DP 2NR
- DP: GUTTENBERG, HOLMES, EDGMON, MUNOZ, T.WILSON, COSTELLO, AUSTERMAN
- NR: NEUMAN, STOLTZE
- FN1: INDETERMINATE(REV)
- COSPONSOR(S): T.WILSON
On February 14, 2014 in the House:
- FSH RPT 4DP
- DP: FEIGE, KREISS-TOMKINS, OLSON, SEATON
- FN1: INDETERMINATE(REV)
On February 7, 2014 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): FEIGE, KREISS-TOMKINS, GATTIS
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- SPONSOR SUBSTITUTE INTRODUCED
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- FSH, FIN
On April 12, 2013 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): KERTTULA
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- FSH, FIN
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor