+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (30)
On May 15, 2002 in the Senate:
- RLS REPORT READ SCS NEW TITLE
- TITLE CHANGE: SCR 13
On May 13, 2002 in the Senate:
- FIN REFERRAL WAIVED REFERRED TO RULES
On April 28, 2001 in the Senate:
- NR: GREEN, LEMAN; DP: WILKEN, DAVIS
- TITLE CHANGE: SCR 13
- HES RPT SCS 2DP 2NR NEW TITLE
On April 24, 2001 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): DYSON
On April 17, 2001 in the Senate:
- HES, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On April 12, 2001 in the House:
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 203(FIN)
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/12/01
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- PASSED Y35 E5
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- COSPONSOR(S): CHENAULT, JAMES, BUNDE
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHB 203(FIN)
On April 11, 2001 in the House:
- WILLIAMS
- LANCASTER, HUDSON, CROFT, MULDER,
- DP: WHITAKER, HARRIS, DAVIES,
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) 8DP
On April 5, 2001 in the House:
- NR: GUESS, JOULE
- DP: PORTER, STEVENS, WILSON, BUNDE;
- EDU RPT CS(EDU) 4DP 2NR
On March 30, 2001 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): CISSNA, STEVENS
On March 28, 2001 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): LANCASTER
On March 22, 2001 in the House:
- EDU, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor