+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On April 4, 2022 in the House:
- COSPONSOR REMOVED: THOMPSON
On March 9, 2022 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): TARR
On March 2, 2022 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): STORY, DRUMMOND
On June 11, 2021 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): HANNAN
On May 28, 2021 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): SPOHNHOLZ
On May 5, 2021 in the House:
- REFERRED TO STATE AFFAIRS
- STA, JUD
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor