+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 6, 2011 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- FIN
- REFERRED TO FINANCE
On April 5, 2011 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/5/2011
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 203(FIN)
- PASSED Y34 N4 E2
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- COSPONSOR(S): HAWKER, MILLETT, OLSON, JOHANSEN, PRUITT
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHB 203(FIN)
On April 4, 2011 in the House:
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) NT 9DP 1NR
- DP: FAIRCLOUGH, GUTTENBERG, T.WILSON, JOULE, HAWKER, COSTELLO, EDGMON, STOLTZE,
- THOMAS
- NR: GARA
- FN1: ZERO(REV)
On March 23, 2011 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- FIN
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor