+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On July 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- FIN
- REFERRED TO FINANCE
On July 26, 2019 in the House:
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 2003(FIN)
- PASSED Y22 N12 E6
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y27 N7 E6
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHB 2003(FIN)
On July 25, 2019 in the House:
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) 7DP 1DNP 1AM
- DP: ORTIZ, LEBON, KNOPP, JOSEPHSON, WOOL, JOHNSTON, FOSTER
- DNP: SULLIVAN-LEONARD
- AM: TILTON
- RULES TO CALENDAR 7/25/2019
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN CS ADOPTED UC
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y10 N20 E10
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 7/26 CALENDAR
On July 24, 2019 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- FIN
- FIN WAIVED PUBLIC HEARING NOTICE, RULE 23(A) Y21 N10 E9
+ − Amendment
AM 1
AM NO 1 FAILED Y10 N20 E10
+ − Sponsor
HOUSE RULES
Type:
Primary Sponsor