+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (58)
On January 29, 2020 in the House:
- RETURNED TO GOVERNOR FOR PERMANENT FILING
On January 24, 2020 in the House:
- DIVIDE QUESTION FAILED Y20 N37 E2 A1
- MOTION TO DIVIDE QUESTION BETWEEN P. 7 & P. 19
- P. 7, LINES 26-27; & P. 19, LINES 13-16 & LINES 25-27
- MOTION TO OVERRIDE LINE ITEM VETOES:
- GOVERNOR VETO SUSTAINED Y37 N20 E2 A1
On October 23, 2019 in the House:
- SIGNED INTO LAW 8/19 CHAPTER 2 SSSLA 19
- 9:11 A.M. 8/7/19 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- PARTIAL VETO AND REDUCTIONS
- OMB SPREADSHEET ATTACHED
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
On July 31, 2019 in the House:
- MANIFEST ERROR(S)
On July 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- ENGROSSED AND RETURNED TO HOUSE 7/30
On July 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR ALL AMS TODAY UC
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UC
- AM NO 2 ADOPTED UC
- AM NO 3 ADOPTED UC
- AM NO 5 ADOPTED Y11 N9
- AM NO 4 FAILED Y9 N11
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 2001(FIN)
- PASSED Y17 N1 E2
On July 29, 2019 in the House:
- WAIVE UNIFORM RULE 41(C) UC
On July 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y18 N- E2
On July 29, 2019 in the House:
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y23 N15 E2
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y32 N6 E2
- CONCUR MESSAGE TAKEN UP UC
On July 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- VERSION: SCS CSHB 2001(FIN) AM S
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- ENGROSSMENT WAIVED, RULE 43(B)
On July 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 7/29 CALENDAR
- FIN SCS ADOPTED UC
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 7/28/2019
- NR: MICCICHE, SHOWER
- DP: HOFFMAN
- AM: STEDMAN, VON IMHOF, WILSON, BISHOP
- FIN RPT SCS 4AM 1DP 2NR SAME TITLE
On July 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- FIN
On July 24, 2019 in the House:
- AM NO 2 FAILED Y11 N20 E9
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN CS ADOPTED Y19 N10 E11
- VERSION: CSHB 2001(FIN) AM
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED Y22 N7 E11
- AM NO 3 ADOPTED Y19 N10 E11
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 2001(FIN) AM
- PASSED Y21 N10 E9
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y29 N2 E9
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
On July 23, 2019 in the House:
- NOT TAKEN UP 7/23 - ON 7/24 CALENDAR
- RULES TO CALENDAR 7/23/2019
On July 22, 2019 in the House:
- AM: TILTON, MERRICK, SULLIVAN-LEONARD
- DP: ORTIZ, LEBON, JOSEPHSON, WOOL, KNOPP, FOSTER, JOHNSTON
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) NT 7DP 3AM
On July 8, 2019 in the House:
- FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Sponsor
HOUSE RULES
Type:
Primary Sponsor