+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 12, 2017 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): STUTES
On May 5, 2017 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): ORTIZ
On May 3, 2017 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): WOOL
On April 19, 2017 in the House:
- REFERRED TO STATE AFFAIRS
- FN1: ZERO(GOV)
- AM: FANSLER
- NR: KREISS-TOMKINS, CLAMAN
- DNP: EASTMAN, KOPP
- DP: LEDOUX
- JUD RPT CS(JUD) NT 1DP 2DNP 2NR 1AM
On April 14, 2017 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): KAWASAKI
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- JUD, STA
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS