+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 26, 2019 in the House:
- FIN WAIVED PUBLIC HEARING NOTICE, RULE 23 UC
On April 22, 2019 in the House:
- REFERRED TO FINANCE
- FN4: (DPS)
- FN3: INDETERMINATE(LAW)
- FN2: INDETERMINATE(ADM)
- FN1: INDETERMINATE(ADM)
- NR: WOOL
- DP: STORY, KREISS-TOMKINS, FIELDS
- STA RPT CS(STA) NT 3DP 1NR
On March 22, 2019 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): RASMUSSEN
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- STA, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- SPONSOR SUBSTITUTE INTRODUCED
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- STA, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/7/19
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor