+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (43)
On November 7, 2018 in the House:
- 3:23 PM 7/25/18 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 7/29 CHAPTER 71 SLA 18
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 10/27/18
On May 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/12/2018
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 2(MLV)
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): COSTELLO, MICCICHE, SHOWER, BISHOP, STEVENS, HOFFMAN, HUGHES
- EGAN, COGHILL, BEGICH, WIELECHOWSKI, MEYER, WILSON, OLSON, VON IMHOF, KELLY
- PASSED Y19 N- E1
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: CSHB 2(MLV)
On May 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- L&C REFERRAL WAIVED
On February 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- CRA RPT 4DP
- DP: BISHOP, GARDNER, HOFFMAN, STEDMAN
- FN3: ZERO(MVA)
- FN4: ZERO(LWF)
On March 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- CRA, L&C
On March 24, 2017 in the House:
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHB 2(MLV)
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/22/2017
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- MLV CS ADOPTED UC
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 2(MLV)
- PASSED Y39 E1
- CHENAULT NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- COSPONSOR(S): FANSLER, GARA, SPOHNHOLZ, JOSEPHSON, CHENAULT, TARR, SADDLER,
- WESTLAKE
On March 13, 2017 in the House:
- L&C RPT CS(MLV) NT 7DP
- DP: STUTES, WOOL, BIRCH, KNOPP, JOSEPHSON, SULLIVAN-LEONARD, KITO
- FN1: ZERO(LWF)
- FN2: ZERO(MVA)
On February 3, 2017 in the House:
- MLV RPT CS(MLV) NT 6DP
- DP: RAUSCHER, REINBOLD, LEDOUX, SADDLER, PARISH, TUCK
- FN1: ZERO(LWF)
- FN2: ZERO(MVA)
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): PARISH
On January 18, 2017 in the House:
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/9/17
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- MLV, L&C
+ − Sponsors (27)
Type:
Primary Sponsor