+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (74)
On May 26, 1998 in the House:
- SIGNED INTO LAW 5/22 CHAPTER 44 SLA 98
- EFFECTIVE DATE OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
On May 6, 1998 in the House:
- 3:30 PM 5/5/98 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 29, 1998 in the Senate:
- CC REPORT ADPT Y19 N1 CCSHB 2
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
On April 27, 1998 in the Senate:
- HOLD ON SECRETARY'S DESK UNAN CONSENT
On April 24, 1998 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): DYSON
On April 24, 1998 in the Senate:
- CONFERENCE COMMITTEE REPORT READ
On April 24, 1998 in the House:
- CC REPORT ADPT Y34 E4 A2 CCSHB 2
On April 23, 1998 in the House:
- REPLACE CROFT WITH KUBINA
On April 20, 1998 in the House:
- CONFERENCE COMMITTEE APPOINTED
- *KOTT,MULDER,CROFT
On April 20, 1998 in the Senate:
- FAILED RECEDE (S) AM Y2 16 E1 A1
- CONFERENCE COMMITTEE APPOINTED
- *SHARP,LEMAN,ELLIS
On April 18, 1998 in the House:
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
- FAILED CONCUR (S) AM Y2 N33 A5
On April 16, 1998 in the Senate:
- RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 2 UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 2 ADOPTED Y19 N1
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 3 UNAN CONSENT
- AM TO AM 3 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 3 AS AMENDED ADOPTED Y12 N8
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y20 N-
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
On April 15, 1998 in the Senate:
- RLS TO CAL 1NR W/SCS NEW TITLE 4/15
- PREVIOUS ZERO FN (REV)
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y2 N17 E1
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 2(FIN)
- PASSED Y17 N2 E1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- ADAMS NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
On February 10, 1998 in the Senate:
- FIN RPT SCS 3DP 3NR 1AM NEW TITLE
- TITLE CHANGE TO BE AUTHORIZED BY SCR 23
- DP: SHARP, PHILLIPS, TORGERSON
- NR: PARNELL, ADAMS, DONLEY; AM: PEARCE
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (REV)
On February 26, 1997 in the Senate:
- STA RPT 1DP 2NR
- DP: GREEN; NR: MILLER, WARD
- (H) FN (REV)
On February 6, 1997 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- STATE AFFAIRS, FINANCE
On February 5, 1997 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/5/97
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 2(FIN)
- PASSED Y32 E2 A6
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- KUBINA NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- RECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UNAN CONSENT
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y38 E2
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- COSPONSOR(S): ROKEBERG, RYAN, JAMES,
- ELTON, CROFT
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
On February 3, 1997 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): HUDSON
On January 31, 1997 in the House:
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) 10DP 1NR
- DP: THERRIAULT, MARTIN, KOHRING, DAVIES,
- GRUSSENDORF, DAVIS, KELLY, FOSTER,
- HANLEY, MULDER; NR: MOSES
- FISCAL NOTE (REV)
On January 24, 1997 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): WILLIAMS
On January 21, 1997 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): DAVIES
On January 16, 1997 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): MARTIN
On January 13, 1997 in the House:
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/3/97
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- FINANCE
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor