+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (33)
On May 16, 2007 in the House:
- DISCHARGE FROM RULES CMTE FLD Y16 N23 E1
On April 10, 2007 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): CISSNA
- RETURNED TO RLS COMMITTEE
- ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED Y20 N17 E3
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
On April 5, 2007 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): ROSES, JOHNSON, SEATON
- COSPONSOR REMOVED: LEDOUX
- HELD TO 4/10 CALENDAR
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/5/2007
On April 4, 2007 in the House:
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) NT 8DP 1NR 2AM
- DP: HAWKER, JOULE, NELSON, FOSTER, THOMAS, KELLY, MEYER, CHENAULT
- NR: STOLTZE
- AM: GARA, CRAWFORD
- FN1: ZERO(ADM)
- FN3: (HSS)
- FN4: (HSS)
- FN5: (HSS)
- FN6: (HSS)
- COSPONSOR(S): JOULE
On March 26, 2007 in the House:
- HES RPT 4DP 1AM
- DP: FAIRCLOUGH, GARDNER, SEATON, WILSON
- AM: CISSNA
- FN1: ZERO(ADM)
- FN2: (HSS)
- COSPONSOR(S): LEDOUX
On March 22, 2007 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): NELSON
On March 21, 2007 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): WILSON
On March 19, 2007 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): THOMAS
On March 16, 2007 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): DOOGAN, FAIRCLOUGH
On March 14, 2007 in the House:
- HES, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor