+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (43)
On July 21, 1993 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE OF LAW 9/5/93
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/7 CHAPTER 56 SLA 93
- 11:25 AM 5/14/93 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 8, 1993 in the Senate:
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOVERNOR NEXT
On May 4, 1993 in the Senate:
- PASSED Y20 N-
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): SHARP, MILLER
- READ THE THIRD TIME SSHB 196
On May 3, 1993 in the Senate:
- HELD TO 5/4/93 CALENDAR
On May 2, 1993 in the Senate:
- HELD TO 5/3/93 CALENDAR
- MOVED TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR
On May 1, 1993 in the Senate:
- HELD TO 5/2/93 CALENDAR
On April 30, 1993 in the Senate:
- HELD TO 5/1/93 CALENDAR
On April 29, 1993 in the Senate:
- THIRD READING 4/30 CALENDAR
- ADVANCE TO 3RD READING FAILED Y10 N9 A1
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES 3CAL 1NR 4/29/93
On April 28, 1993 in the Senate:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): DONLEY
On April 27, 1993 in the Senate:
- PREVIOUS H ZERO FNS (DMVA, ADM)
- L&C RPT 2DP 1NR
On April 26, 1993 in the Senate:
- PHILLIPS, TAYLOR, HALFORD
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): LEMAN, KELLY,
On April 23, 1993 in the Senate:
- PREVIOUS H ZERO FNS (DMVA, ADM)
- STA RPT 4DP
On April 20, 1993 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- STA, L&C
On April 19, 1993 in the House:
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- COSPONSOR(S): MENARD
- PASSED Y38 N- A2
- READ THE THIRD TIME SSHB 196
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/19/93
On April 13, 1993 in the House:
- STA RPT 6DP
- -2 PREV ZERO FNS (DMVA, ADM) 3/19/93
- DP: KOTT, SANDERS, G.DAVIS, OLBERG
- DP: B.DAVIS, VEZEY
On March 19, 1993 in the House:
- -2 ZERO FNS (DMVA, ADM) 3/19/93
- DP: FOSTER, WILLIS, KOTT, MULDER
- MLV RPT 4DP
On March 12, 1993 in the House:
- MILITARY & VETERANS AFFAIRS, STA
- SPONSOR SUBSTITUTE INTRODUCED-REFERRALS
On March 3, 1993 in the House:
- MILITARY & VETERANS AFFAIRS, STA
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor