+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (58)
On June 22, 2008 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/15/08
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/17 CHAPTER 100 SLA 08
On June 10, 2008 in the House:
- 1:23 PM 6/9/08 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 30, 2008 in the House:
- MANIFEST ERROR(S)
On April 11, 2008 in the Senate:
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
- RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
- AM NO 2 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 2 UNAN CONSENT
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y20 N-
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: SCS CSHB 196(JUD) AM S
On April 11, 2008 in the House:
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y36 E1 A3
On April 10, 2008 in the Senate:
- RECONSIDERATION HELD TO 4/11
On April 9, 2008 in the Senate:
- BUNDE NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- PASSED Y19 N- A1
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 196(JUD)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y7 N12 A1
- JUD SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/9/2008
On April 8, 2008 in the Senate:
- DP: THERRIAULT, HUGGINS, MCGUIRE
- TITLE CHANGE: SCR 28
- JUD RPT SCS 3DP 1NR NEW TITLE
- NR: FRENCH
- FN5: ZERO(LAW)
- FN6: ZERO(HSS)
- FN7: ZERO(CRT)
On April 1, 2008 in the Senate:
- FN6: ZERO(HSS)
- FN5: ZERO(LAW)
- FN4: ZERO(CRT)
- NR: FRENCH, STEVENS, GREEN
- DP: MCGUIRE, BUNDE
- TITLE CHANGE: SCR FORTHCOMING
- STA RPT SCS 2DP 3NR NEW TITLE
On March 10, 2008 in the Senate:
- FN4: ZERO(CRT)
- FN3: ZERO(LAW)
- DP: ELLIS, BUNDE, DAVIS
- L&C RPT SCS 3DP SAME TITLE
On April 23, 2007 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- L&C, STA, JUD
On April 20, 2007 in the House:
- VERSION: CSHB 196(JUD)
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- PASSED Y38 N1 E1
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 196(JUD)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- JUD CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/20/2007
On April 11, 2007 in the House:
- FN2: ZERO(LAW)
- FN1: ZERO(CRT)
- NR: SAMUELS
- DP: GRUENBERG, LYNN, COGHILL, HOLMES, RAMRAS
- JUD RPT CS(JUD) 5DP 1NR
On March 14, 2007 in the House:
- JUD
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
JUDICIARY
Type:
Primary Sponsor