+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On April 22, 2024 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): GALVIN
On April 3, 2024 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): CARRICK
On March 6, 2024 in the House:
- HSS RPT 7DP
- DP: FIELDS, SUMNER, RUFFRIDGE, MCCORMICK, SADDLER, MINA, PRAX
- FN1: (DOH)
- FN2: (DOH)
- REFERRED TO FINANCE
On February 26, 2024 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): SUMNER
On February 15, 2024 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): EDGMON, MCCORMICK, GRAY
On February 14, 2024 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): FOSTER, WRIGHT
On February 12, 2024 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): HIMSCHOOT
On January 16, 2024 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): STORY, HANNAN
On May 10, 2023 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): DIBERT
On May 9, 2023 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): GROH
On May 8, 2023 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- HSS, FIN
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor