+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (57)
On September 7, 2004 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
- MANIFEST ERROR(S)
- 10:01AM 6/30/04 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 7/3 CHAPTER 152 SLA 04
On June 18, 2004 in the Senate:
- ENGROSSED AND RETURNED TO THE HOUSE
On May 11, 2004 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/11/2004
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ 3RD TIME SCS CSHB 196(RES) AM S
- PASSED Y20 N-
- RES SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): FRENCH, DYSON, ELTON,
- ELLIS, GUESS
- ENGROSSMENT WAIVED, RULE 43(B)
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: SCS CSHB 196(RES) AM S
On May 11, 2004 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y38 E1 A1
On May 7, 2004 in the Senate:
- RES RPT SCS 5DP 1AM SAME TITLE
- AM: OGAN; DP: WAGONER, DYSON,
- LINCOLN, ELTON, SEEKINS
- FN3: ZERO(DNR)
- FN4: ZERO(DEC)
On February 12, 2004 in the House:
- COSPONSOR REMOVED: KOHRING
On May 18, 2003 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): KOHRING
On May 17, 2003 in the House:
- PASSED Y34 N1 E2 A3
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/17/2003
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- CS(RES) RECEIVED
- FN2: ZERO(H.RLS/DNR)
- RES CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 196(RES)
On May 17, 2003 in the Senate:
- RES
On May 17, 2003 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- RECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UNAN CONSENT
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y35 N1 E2 A2
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- COSPONSOR(S): WILSON, LYNN
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHB 196(RES)
On May 17, 2003 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On May 17, 2003 in the House:
- KERTTULA NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
On May 16, 2003 in the House:
- DP: HEINZE, GUTTENBERG, CISSNA, FATE;
- RES RPT CS(RES)FORTHCOMING 4DP 1DNP 2NR
- FN1: (DNR)
- DNP: WOLF; NR: MORGAN, GATTO
- FIN REFERRAL WAIVED
On May 15, 2003 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): KOTT
On May 14, 2003 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): KERTTULA, HAWKER
On May 7, 2003 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): GUTTENBERG
On April 23, 2003 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): GARA
On March 14, 2003 in the House:
- RES, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor