+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (48)
On June 7, 2001 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
- SIGNED INTO LAW 5/9 CHAPTER 27 SLA 01
On May 4, 2001 in the House:
- 1:10 PM 5/4/01 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 2, 2001 in the Senate:
- VERSION: CSHB 194(FIN)
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED Y19 N- A1
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 194(FIN)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3OR 5/2/01
On April 28, 2001 in the Senate:
- NR: DONLEY, KELLY, WARD, WILKEN,
- FIN RPT 2DP 7NR
- HOFFMAN, OLSON, GREEN;
- FN3: (DFG); FN4: (DFG)
- DP: AUSTERMAN, LEMAN
On April 26, 2001 in the Senate:
- FN4: (DFG)
- NR: PEARCE, LINCOLN
- DP: TORGERSON, ELTON, TAYLOR;
- RES RPT 3DP 2NR
On April 23, 2001 in the Senate:
- RES, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On April 20, 2001 in the House:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/20/01
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 194(FIN)
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHB 194(FIN)
- PASSED Y39 E1
On April 18, 2001 in the House:
- FN2: (DFG); FN3: (DFG)
- WILLIAMS; NR: BUNDE
- HUDSON, FOSTER, MOSES, MULDER,
- DP: HARRIS, CROFT, DAVIES, LANCASTER,
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) 9DP 1NR
On April 12, 2001 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): MOSES
On March 29, 2001 in the House:
- RES RPT 5DP 2NR
- FN1: (DFG)
- DP: KERTTULA, CHENAULT, STEVENS, FATE,
- SCALZI; NR: MCGUIRE, GREEN
On March 27, 2001 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): KERTTULA
- FN1: (DFG)
- WILSON, STEVENS
- DP: DYSON, COGHILL, SCALZI, KERTTULA,
- FSH RPT 6DP
On March 19, 2001 in the House:
- FSH, RES, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor