+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (51)
On September 19, 2014 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 10/8/14
- SIGNED INTO LAW 7/10 CHAPTER 74 SLA 14
- 9:55 AM 7/2/14 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- FN4: (REV)
- FN(S) ATTACHED TO APPROP. BILL HB 266
- LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 5/14/14
On September 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 5/14/14
On April 22, 2014 in the House:
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y33 E3 A4
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
On April 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/21/2014
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 193(FIN)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- PASSED Y19 N- A1
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: SCS CSHB 193(FIN)
On April 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- FN5: ZERO(CED)
- FN4: (REV)
- DP: MEYER, FAIRCLOUGH, DUNLEAVY, HOFFMAN
- TITLE CHANGE: SCR 25
- FIN RPT SCS 4DP NEW TITLE
On June 24, 2013 in the House:
- FN3: (H.FIN/REV)
- FN(S) ATTACHED TO APPROP. BILL HB 65
- LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 5/7/13
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 193(FIN)
- VERSION: CSHB 193(FIN)
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/10/2013
- PASSED Y39 E1
- GARA NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- RECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UNAN CONSENT
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y39 E1
- COSPONSOR(S): DRUMMOND
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) 7DP 3NR 1AM
- DP: HOLMES, NEUMAN, THOMPSON, T.WILSON, GARA, COSTELLO, AUSTERMAN
- NR: MUNOZ, EDGMON, STOLTZE
- AM: KAWASAKI
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
- FN3: (H.FIN/REV)
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- FN2: (REV)
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
- DP: FOSTER, HERRON, REINBOLD, LEDOUX, NAGEAK
- CRA RPT 5DP
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- CRA, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor