+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (36)
On June 11, 2021 in the House:
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/9 CHAPTER 5 SLA 21
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/10/21
On June 9, 2021 in the House:
- 3:50 P.M. 6/8/21 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/17/2021
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 192
- PASSED Y19 N- E1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: HB 192
On May 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- L&C RPT 4DP
- DP: COSTELLO, MICCICHE, REVAK, STEVENS
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
On May 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- L&C
On May 6, 2021 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/6/2021
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y19 N20 E1
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 192
- BEFORE HOUSE IN THIRD READING
- PASSED Y38 N1 E1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y39 E1
- COSPONSOR(S): PATKOTAK, FIELDS, SPOHNHOLZ, JOSEPHSON, TUCK, TARR
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: HB 192
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- CRA RPT 4DP 3AM
- DP: MCCARTY, DRUMMOND, HANNAN, SCHRAGE
- AM: MCCABE, PRAX, PATKOTAK
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
- COSPONSOR(S): DRUMMOND
On May 3, 2021 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): SCHRAGE, HANNAN
On April 30, 2021 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): HOPKINS
On April 28, 2021 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- CRA
+ − Amendment
AM 1
AM NO 1 FAILED Y19 N20 E1
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor