+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (55)
On May 1, 2000 in the Senate:
- *WILKEN, KELLY TIM, LINCOLN
- CONFERENCE COMMITTEE APPOINTED
- FAILED RECEDE (S) AM Y9 N11
On April 30, 2000 in the House:
- CONFERENCE COMMITTEE APPOINTED
- FAILED CONCUR (S) AM Y2 N38
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
- *DYSON, MULDER, KEMPLEN
On April 29, 2000 in the Senate:
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
On April 28, 2000 in the Senate:
- RECONSIDERATION HELD TO 4/29/00
On April 27, 2000 in the Senate:
- RECONSIDERATION HELD TO 4/28/00
On April 26, 2000 in the Senate:
- READ THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 191(FIN) AM S
- RULES TO 1ST SUP CALENDAR 4/26/00
- PASSED Y19 N1
- MACKIE NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
On April 20, 2000 in the Senate:
- RETURNED TO RLS COMMITTEE
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED Y11 N9
- DONLEY, GREEN, WARD
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): HALFORD, PEARCE,
- FIN SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/20/00
On April 15, 2000 in the Senate:
- HOUSE FISCAL NOTE (DOE #3)
- NR: PHILLIPS, ADAMS, WILKEN
- DP: TORGERSON, PARNELL, GREEN, LEMAN;
- FIN RPT SCS 4DP 3NR SAME TITLE
On April 11, 2000 in the Senate:
- HES RPT SCS 2DP 2NR 1AM SAME TITLE
- HOUSE FISCAL NOTE (DOE #3)
- PETE KELLY; AM: WILKEN
- DP: MILLER, PEARCE; NR: ELTON,
On March 2, 2000 in the Senate:
- HES, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On March 1, 2000 in the House:
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- COSPONSOR(S): ROKEBERG
- PASSED Y34 N5 E1
- RETURN 2ND FOR AM 2 FLD Y16 N23 E1
- RETURN 2ND FOR AM 1 FLD Y16 N19 E1 A4
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 191(FIN)
On February 28, 2000 in the House:
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/28/00
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 3/1 CALENDAR
On February 11, 2000 in the House:
- FISCAL NOTE (DOE)
- NR: THERRIAULT, BUNDE, DAVIS
- GRUSSENDORF, MOSES, WILLIAMS;
- DP: FOSTER, MULDER; DNP: AUSTERMAN,
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) NT 2DP 4DNP 3NR
On February 4, 2000 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): MULDER
On April 29, 1999 in the House:
- 2 FISCAL NOTES (DOE)
- WHITAKER, KEMPLEN, BRICE
- DP: DYSON; NR: GREEN, MORGAN, COGHILL,
- HES RPT CS(HES) 1DP 6NR
On April 13, 1999 in the House:
- HES, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor