+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 31, 2014 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): DRUMMOND
- REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
- FN5: INDETERMINATE(LAW)
- FN4: INDETERMINATE(ADM)
- FN3: ZERO(EED)
- FN2: ZERO(COR)
- FN1: ZERO(ADM)
- NR: LEDOUX, SADDLER, GATTIS
- DP: P.WILSON, SEATON, DRUMMOND
- EDC RPT CS(EDC) 3DP 3NR
On March 10, 2014 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): KITO III
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): GATTIS
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): NAGEAK
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- EDC, JUD
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor